Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1245 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Turner of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Duncan) H.B. No. 1245
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2013;
 May 8, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 20, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 20, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the allocation of money in the judicial and court
 personnel training fund.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 56.004, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  The legislature shall appropriate funds from the
 judicial and court personnel training fund to the court of criminal
 appeals to provide for:
 (1)  continuing legal education, technical assistance,
 and other support programs for prosecuting attorneys and their
 personnel, criminal defense attorneys who regularly represent
 indigent defendants in criminal matters and their personnel, and
 justices of the peace and their court personnel; and
 (2)  innocence training programs for law enforcement
 officers, law students, and other participants.
 (c)  An allocation of funds to provide for continuing legal
 education, technical assistance, and other support programs for the
 personnel of criminal defense attorneys who regularly represent
 indigent defendants in criminal matters as described by Subsection
 (b)(1) must come from the grant of legal funds made by the court of
 criminal appeals under Section 56.003(f).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2014.
 * * * * *