Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1271 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Martinez Fischer (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 1271
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2013;
 April 24, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 8, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 8, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to providing links in the online text of proposed
 legislation to other state laws referenced in that legislation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 323.0145, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  If the text of a document described by Subsection
 (a)(2)(C) or (D) includes a cross-reference to a section of state
 statute, the council to the extent feasible shall include in any
 electronic version of the document made available to the public
 through the Internet an electronic link or other method by which a
 person reading the document may automatically access the text of
 the referenced section.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a bill or joint resolution filed, or an amendment or substitute
 adopted by a legislative committee, on or after the effective date
 of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect November 1, 2014.
 * * * * *