House | 05/10/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3036 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 160 | Journal Page: 3036 |
House | 05/10/2013 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 3036 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3024 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3024 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1531 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 490 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 490 | |
House | 02/14/2013 | Filed |