Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1305 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Sheets (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.B. No. 1305
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2013;
 April 24, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; May 1, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 1, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the criminal penalty for acting as an agent after
 suspension or revocation of the agent's license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 4005.151(b), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  An offense under this section is a felony of the third
 degree [punishable by:
 [(1)  a fine not to exceed $5,000;
 [(2)     imprisonment for a term of not more than two
 years; or
 [(3)     both fine and imprisonment under this
 subsection].
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *