1 | 1 | | By: Miller of Comal, Lewis, Clardy H.B. No. 1325 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (Senate Sponsor - Duncan) |
---|
3 | 3 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2013; |
---|
4 | 4 | | April 25, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on State |
---|
5 | 5 | | Affairs; April 29, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
6 | 6 | | Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 29, 2013, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 11 | | relating to the dismissal of certain actions arising from exposure |
---|
12 | 12 | | to asbestos and silica. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. The heading to Section 90.007, Civil Practice |
---|
15 | 15 | | and Remedies Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | Sec. 90.007. MOTION TO DISMISS IN ACTION FILED ON OR AFTER |
---|
17 | 17 | | SEPTEMBER 1, 2005. |
---|
18 | 18 | | SECTION 2. Section 90.007(a), Civil Practice and Remedies |
---|
19 | 19 | | Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
20 | 20 | | (a) In an action filed on or after September 1, 2005 [the |
---|
21 | 21 | | date this chapter becomes law], if a claimant fails to timely serve |
---|
22 | 22 | | a report on a defendant, or serves on the defendant a report that |
---|
23 | 23 | | does not comply with the requirements of Section 90.003 or 90.004, |
---|
24 | 24 | | the defendant may file a motion to dismiss the claimant's |
---|
25 | 25 | | asbestos-related claims or silica-related claims. The motion must |
---|
26 | 26 | | be filed on or before the 30th day after the date the report is |
---|
27 | 27 | | served on the defendant. If a claimant fails to serve a report on |
---|
28 | 28 | | the defendant, the motion must be filed on or before the 30th day |
---|
29 | 29 | | after the date the report was required to be served on the defendant |
---|
30 | 30 | | under Section 90.006. If the basis of the motion is that the |
---|
31 | 31 | | claimant has served on the defendant a report that does not comply |
---|
32 | 32 | | with Section 90.003 or 90.004, the motion must include the reasons |
---|
33 | 33 | | why the report does not comply with that section. |
---|
34 | 34 | | SECTION 3. Section 90.010, Civil Practice and Remedies |
---|
35 | 35 | | Code, is amended by amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsections |
---|
36 | 36 | | (d-1), (l), (m), (n), and (o) to read as follows: |
---|
37 | 37 | | (d) In an action that was pending on August 31, 2005, [the |
---|
38 | 38 | | date this chapter becomes law] that was [is] transferred to and |
---|
39 | 39 | | remains [or] pending in an MDL pretrial court, the [and in which the |
---|
40 | 40 | | claimant does not serve a report that complies with Section 90.003 |
---|
41 | 41 | | or 90.004, the MDL pretrial court shall not dismiss the action |
---|
42 | 42 | | pursuant to this chapter but shall retain jurisdiction over the |
---|
43 | 43 | | action under the MDL rules. The] MDL pretrial court shall not |
---|
44 | 44 | | remand such action for trial unless: |
---|
45 | 45 | | (1) the claimant serves a report complying with |
---|
46 | 46 | | Section 90.003 or 90.004; or |
---|
47 | 47 | | (2)(A) the claimant does not serve a report that |
---|
48 | 48 | | complies with Section 90.003 or 90.004; |
---|
49 | 49 | | (B) the claimant serves a report complying with |
---|
50 | 50 | | Subsection (f)(1); and |
---|
51 | 51 | | (C) the court, on motion and hearing, makes the |
---|
52 | 52 | | findings required by Subsection (f)(2). |
---|
53 | 53 | | (d-1) Beginning on September 1, 2014, the MDL pretrial court |
---|
54 | 54 | | shall dismiss each action for an asbestos-related injury or a |
---|
55 | 55 | | silica-related injury that was pending on August 31, 2005, unless a |
---|
56 | 56 | | report was served on or after September 1, 2013, that complies with |
---|
57 | 57 | | Section 90.003, Section 90.004, or Subsection (f). The MDL |
---|
58 | 58 | | pretrial court shall provide for the dismissal of such actions in a |
---|
59 | 59 | | case management order entered for that purpose. All such actions |
---|
60 | 60 | | shall be dismissed on or before August 31, 2015. |
---|
61 | 61 | | (l) A dismissal under Subsection (d-1) is without prejudice |
---|
62 | 62 | | to the claimant's right to file a subsequent action seeking damages |
---|
63 | 63 | | arising from an asbestos-related injury or a silica-related injury. |
---|
64 | 64 | | (m) This chapter and Section 16.0031 apply to a subsequent |
---|
65 | 65 | | action for an asbestos-related injury or a silica-related injury |
---|
66 | 66 | | filed by a claimant whose action was dismissed under Subsection |
---|
67 | 67 | | (d-1) or by a claimant in an action described by Subsection (d) who |
---|
68 | 68 | | voluntarily dismissed the action under Section 90.008. |
---|
69 | 69 | | (n) If a claimant subsequently refiles an action for an |
---|
70 | 70 | | asbestos-related injury or a silica-related injury that was |
---|
71 | 71 | | dismissed under Subsection (d-1), the refiled action is treated for |
---|
72 | 72 | | purposes of determining the applicable law as if that claimant's |
---|
73 | 73 | | action had never been dismissed but, instead, had remained pending |
---|
74 | 74 | | until the claimant served a report that complied with Section |
---|
75 | 75 | | 90.003, Section 90.004, or Subsection (f). |
---|
76 | 76 | | (o) A claimant whose action was dismissed under Subsection |
---|
77 | 77 | | (d-1) may serve the petition and citation for any subsequently |
---|
78 | 78 | | filed action for an asbestos-related or silica-related injury by |
---|
79 | 79 | | certified mail, return receipt requested, or other method approved |
---|
80 | 80 | | by the MDL pretrial court that is likely to accomplish service in a |
---|
81 | 81 | | cost-effective manner, on a person who was a defendant in the |
---|
82 | 82 | | dismissed action. |
---|
83 | 83 | | SECTION 4. (a) Section 90.010, Civil Practice and Remedies |
---|
84 | 84 | | Code, as amended by this Act, applies to an action pending in the |
---|
85 | 85 | | multidistrict litigation pretrial court on, or referred to the |
---|
86 | 86 | | multidistrict litigation pretrial court on or after, the effective |
---|
87 | 87 | | date of this Act. |
---|
88 | 88 | | (b) Nothing in this Act is intended to be regarded as a |
---|
89 | 89 | | decision on the merits of a dismissed action, to affect the rights |
---|
90 | 90 | | of any party in a bankruptcy proceeding, or to affect the ability of |
---|
91 | 91 | | any person to satisfy the claim criteria for compensable claims or |
---|
92 | 92 | | demands under a trust established pursuant to a plan of |
---|
93 | 93 | | reorganization under Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy |
---|
94 | 94 | | Code (11 U.S.C. Section 1101 et seq.). With respect to the |
---|
95 | 95 | | administrative dismissal of an action under Section 90.010(d-1), |
---|
96 | 96 | | Civil Practice and Remedies Code, as added by this Act, the tort |
---|
97 | 97 | | system rights of the dismissed actions are specifically preserved. |
---|
98 | 98 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
99 | 99 | | * * * * * |
---|