Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1325 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Miller of Comal, Lewis, Clardy H.B. No. 1325
 (Senate Sponsor - Duncan)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2013;
 April 25, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; April 29, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 29, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the dismissal of certain actions arising from exposure
 to asbestos and silica.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 90.007, Civil Practice
 and Remedies Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 90.007.  MOTION TO DISMISS IN ACTION FILED ON OR AFTER
 SEPTEMBER 1, 2005.
 SECTION 2.  Section 90.007(a), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In an action filed on or after September 1, 2005 [the
 date this chapter becomes law], if a claimant fails to timely serve
 a report on a defendant, or serves on the defendant a report that
 does not comply with the requirements of Section 90.003 or 90.004,
 the defendant may file a motion to dismiss the claimant's
 asbestos-related claims or silica-related claims.  The motion must
 be filed on or before the 30th day after the date the report is
 served on the defendant.  If a claimant fails to serve a report on
 the defendant, the motion must be filed on or before the 30th day
 after the date the report was required to be served on the defendant
 under Section 90.006.  If the basis of the motion is that the
 claimant has served on the defendant a report that does not comply
 with Section 90.003 or 90.004, the motion must include the reasons
 why the report does not comply with that section.
 SECTION 3.  Section 90.010, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended by amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsections
 (d-1), (l), (m), (n), and (o) to read as follows:
 (d)  In an action that was pending on August 31, 2005, [the
 date this chapter becomes law] that was [is] transferred to and
 remains [or] pending in an MDL pretrial court, the [and in which the
 claimant does not serve a report that complies with Section 90.003
 or 90.004, the MDL pretrial court shall not dismiss the action
 pursuant to this chapter but shall retain jurisdiction over the
 action under the MDL rules. The] MDL pretrial court shall not
 remand such action for trial unless:
 (1)  the claimant serves a report complying with
 Section 90.003 or 90.004; or
 (2)(A)  the claimant does not serve a report that
 complies with Section 90.003 or 90.004;
 (B)  the claimant serves a report complying with
 Subsection (f)(1); and
 (C)  the court, on motion and hearing, makes the
 findings required by Subsection (f)(2).
 (d-1)  Beginning on September 1, 2014, the MDL pretrial court
 shall dismiss each action for an asbestos-related injury or a
 silica-related injury that was pending on August 31, 2005, unless a
 report was served on or after September 1, 2013, that complies with
 Section 90.003, Section 90.004, or Subsection (f). The MDL
 pretrial court shall provide for the dismissal of such actions in a
 case management order entered for that purpose. All such actions
 shall be dismissed on or before August 31, 2015.
 (l)  A dismissal under Subsection (d-1) is without prejudice
 to the claimant's right to file a subsequent action seeking damages
 arising from an asbestos-related injury or a silica-related injury.
 (m)  This chapter and Section 16.0031 apply to a subsequent
 action for an asbestos-related injury or a silica-related injury
 filed by a claimant whose action was dismissed under Subsection
 (d-1) or by a claimant in an action described by Subsection (d) who
 voluntarily dismissed the action under Section 90.008.
 (n)  If a claimant subsequently refiles an action for an
 asbestos-related injury or a silica-related injury that was
 dismissed under Subsection (d-1), the refiled action is treated for
 purposes of determining the applicable law as if that claimant's
 action had never been dismissed but, instead, had remained pending
 until the claimant served a report that complied with Section
 90.003, Section 90.004, or Subsection (f).
 (o)  A claimant whose action was dismissed under Subsection
 (d-1) may serve the petition and citation for any subsequently
 filed action for an asbestos-related or silica-related injury by
 certified mail, return receipt requested, or other method approved
 by the MDL pretrial court that is likely to accomplish service in a
 cost-effective manner, on a person who was a defendant in the
 dismissed action.
 SECTION 4.  (a)  Section 90.010, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, as amended by this Act, applies to an action pending in the
 multidistrict litigation pretrial court on, or referred to the
 multidistrict litigation pretrial court on or after, the effective
 date of this Act.
 (b)  Nothing in this Act is intended to be regarded as a
 decision on the merits of a dismissed action, to affect the rights
 of any party in a bankruptcy proceeding, or to affect the ability of
 any person to satisfy the claim criteria for compensable claims or
 demands under a trust established pursuant to a plan of
 reorganization under Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy
 Code (11 U.S.C. Section 1101 et seq.). With respect to the
 administrative dismissal of an action under Section 90.010(d-1),
 Civil Practice and Remedies Code, as added by this Act, the tort
 system rights of the dismissed actions are specifically preserved.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *