Senate | 05/13/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1687 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3019 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2764 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Record vote | RV#669 | Journal Page: 2764 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2764 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2764 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2744 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2744 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1582 | |
House | 04/09/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 518 | |
House | 02/26/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 518 | |
House | 02/15/2013 | Filed |