1 | 1 | | 83R2758 SGA-F |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Hunter H.B. No. 1361 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to validating certain acts of the Lower Nueces River Water |
---|
8 | 8 | | Supply District transferring real property rights. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. On or before August 1, 1986, in accordance with |
---|
11 | 11 | | Chapter 844, Acts of the 69th Legislature, Regular Session, 1985, |
---|
12 | 12 | | the board of directors of the Lower Nueces River Water Supply |
---|
13 | 13 | | District paid or provided for the payment of all debts and |
---|
14 | 14 | | liabilities of the district and transferred all district assets to |
---|
15 | 15 | | the City of Corpus Christi, including all district rights to real |
---|
16 | 16 | | property. Additionally, the district's enabling legislation, |
---|
17 | 17 | | Chapter 159, Acts of the 51st Legislature, Regular Session, 1949, |
---|
18 | 18 | | was repealed, and the Lower Nueces River Water Supply District was |
---|
19 | 19 | | dissolved in accordance with Chapter 844. |
---|
20 | 20 | | SECTION 2. (a) The governmental acts and proceedings of |
---|
21 | 21 | | the Lower Nueces River Water Supply District taken to comply with |
---|
22 | 22 | | Chapter 844, Acts of the 69th Legislature, Regular Session, 1985, |
---|
23 | 23 | | relating to the 1986 transfer to the City of Corpus Christi of |
---|
24 | 24 | | district rights to real property included in the 1986 quitclaim |
---|
25 | 25 | | deed recordings described by Section 3 of this Act are validated and |
---|
26 | 26 | | confirmed as of the dates the transfers occurred. The acts and |
---|
27 | 27 | | proceedings may not be held invalid because they were not performed |
---|
28 | 28 | | in accordance with Chapter 51, Water Code, or other law. |
---|
29 | 29 | | (b) The 1986 transfer of rights to real property included in |
---|
30 | 30 | | the 1986 quitclaim deed recordings described by Section 3 of this |
---|
31 | 31 | | Act by the Lower Nueces River Water Supply District to the City of |
---|
32 | 32 | | Corpus Christi may not be held invalid on the ground that the |
---|
33 | 33 | | transfer, in the absence of this Act, was invalid. |
---|
34 | 34 | | (c) The City of Corpus Christi is the owner of the rights to |
---|
35 | 35 | | real property transferred to the city in accordance with Chapter |
---|
36 | 36 | | 844, Acts of the 69th Legislature, Regular Session, 1985, and |
---|
37 | 37 | | included in the 1986 quitclaim deed recordings described by Section |
---|
38 | 38 | | 3 of this Act. |
---|
39 | 39 | | (d) This section does not apply to any matter that on the |
---|
40 | 40 | | effective date of this Act: |
---|
41 | 41 | | (1) is involved in litigation if the litigation |
---|
42 | 42 | | ultimately results in the matter being held invalid by a final court |
---|
43 | 43 | | judgment; or |
---|
44 | 44 | | (2) has been held invalid by a final court judgment. |
---|
45 | 45 | | SECTION 3. The property transfers made in 1986 as quitclaim |
---|
46 | 46 | | deeds in accordance with Section 3, Chapter 844, Acts of the 69th |
---|
47 | 47 | | Legislature, Regular Session, 1985, transferring property from the |
---|
48 | 48 | | Lower Nueces River Water Supply District to the City of Corpus |
---|
49 | 49 | | Christi have been filed as follows: |
---|
50 | 50 | | (1) in Nueces County on September 26, 2011, as |
---|
51 | 51 | | Document 2011034981 filed in the property records of Nueces County; |
---|
52 | 52 | | (2) in Atascosa County on September 30, 2011, as |
---|
53 | 53 | | recording number 125295 filed in the property records of Atascosa |
---|
54 | 54 | | County; |
---|
55 | 55 | | (3) in Jim Wells County on September 27, 2011, as |
---|
56 | 56 | | recording number 413632 filed in the property records of Jim Wells |
---|
57 | 57 | | County; |
---|
58 | 58 | | (4) in Live Oak County on September 27, 2011, as |
---|
59 | 59 | | recording number 195798 filed in the property records of Live Oak |
---|
60 | 60 | | County; and |
---|
61 | 61 | | (5) in San Patricio County on September 27, 2011, as |
---|
62 | 62 | | recording number 611795 filed in the property records of San |
---|
63 | 63 | | Patricio County. |
---|
64 | 64 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
65 | 65 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
66 | 66 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
67 | 67 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
68 | 68 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|