Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1384 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Bell, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 1384
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2013;
 May 10, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a county road department to accept
 donations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 252, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 252.314 to read as follows:
 Sec. 252.314.  DONATIONS. A commissioners court may accept
 donations of labor, money, or other property to aid in the building
 or maintaining of roads in the county.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *