1 | 1 | | By: King of Taylor, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 1392 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2013; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
---|
4 | 4 | | and Human Services; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the |
---|
5 | 5 | | following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to information provided by the Department of State Health |
---|
11 | 11 | | Services on food regulation. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 438, Health and Safety Code, is amended |
---|
14 | 14 | | by adding Subchapter H to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 15 | | SUBCHAPTER H. INFORMATION ON DEPARTMENT FOOD REGULATION |
---|
16 | 16 | | Sec. 438.151. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (1) "Department" means the Department of State Health |
---|
18 | 18 | | Services. |
---|
19 | 19 | | (2) "Executive commissioner" means the executive |
---|
20 | 20 | | commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission. |
---|
21 | 21 | | Sec. 438.152. REQUEST FOR INFORMATION. Unless otherwise |
---|
22 | 22 | | prohibited by state or federal law, on receipt of a written request |
---|
23 | 23 | | for information pertaining to the regulation of food under this |
---|
24 | 24 | | subtitle, the department shall provide a reasonable and substantial |
---|
25 | 25 | | response to the request not later than the 30th day after the date |
---|
26 | 26 | | the department receives the request. |
---|
27 | 27 | | Sec. 438.153. REQUEST FOR OFFICIAL DETERMINATION. (a) On |
---|
28 | 28 | | receipt of a written request regarding the applicability to a |
---|
29 | 29 | | specific circumstance of a regulation or the requirements for |
---|
30 | 30 | | compliance with the regulation, the department shall provide an |
---|
31 | 31 | | official written determination regarding the applicability of the |
---|
32 | 32 | | regulation or the requirements for compliance with the regulation |
---|
33 | 33 | | to the requestor not later than the 30th day after the date the |
---|
34 | 34 | | department receives the request. |
---|
35 | 35 | | (b) An official determination made under this section is |
---|
36 | 36 | | valid until the regulation that is the subject of the determination |
---|
37 | 37 | | is amended by statute or department rule. |
---|
38 | 38 | | Sec. 438.154. EFFECT OF OFFICIAL DETERMINATION. An |
---|
39 | 39 | | inspector may not issue to a person a citation for a violation of a |
---|
40 | 40 | | food regulation governed by this subtitle if the person provides |
---|
41 | 41 | | the inspector with an official determination made under Section |
---|
42 | 42 | | 438.153 that contradicts the opinion of the inspector. |
---|
43 | 43 | | Sec. 438.155. RULES. (a) The executive commissioner shall |
---|
44 | 44 | | adopt rules to implement this subchapter. |
---|
45 | 45 | | (b) The executive commissioner periodically shall evaluate |
---|
46 | 46 | | the department's food safety rules and modify the rules as |
---|
47 | 47 | | necessary to improve consistency and communication in food |
---|
48 | 48 | | regulation in this state. |
---|
49 | 49 | | SECTION 2. (a) Not later than December 1, 2013, the |
---|
50 | 50 | | executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission |
---|
51 | 51 | | shall adopt the rules necessary to implement Subchapter H, Chapter |
---|
52 | 52 | | 438, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
53 | 53 | | (b) This Act applies only to a request for information or |
---|
54 | 54 | | official determination made under Subchapter H, Chapter 438, Health |
---|
55 | 55 | | and Safety Code, as added by this Act, to the Department of State |
---|
56 | 56 | | Health Services on or after January 1, 2014. A request for |
---|
57 | 57 | | information or official determination made to the Department of |
---|
58 | 58 | | State Health Services before January 1, 2014, is governed by the law |
---|
59 | 59 | | in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and |
---|
60 | 60 | | that law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
61 | 61 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
62 | 62 | | * * * * * |
---|