Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1392 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: King of Taylor, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 1392
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2013;
 May 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to information provided by the Department of State Health
 Services on food regulation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 438, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter H to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER H. INFORMATION ON DEPARTMENT FOOD REGULATION
 Sec. 438.151.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Department" means the Department of State Health
 Services.
 (2)  "Executive commissioner" means the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission.
 Sec. 438.152.  REQUEST FOR INFORMATION. Unless otherwise
 prohibited by state or federal law, on receipt of a written request
 for information pertaining to the regulation of food under this
 subtitle, the department shall provide a reasonable and substantial
 response to the request not later than the 30th day after the date
 the department receives the request.
 Sec. 438.153.  REQUEST FOR OFFICIAL DETERMINATION. (a) On
 receipt of a written request regarding the applicability to a
 specific circumstance of a regulation or the requirements for
 compliance with the regulation, the department shall provide an
 official written determination regarding the applicability of the
 regulation or the requirements for compliance with the regulation
 to the requestor not later than the 30th day after the date the
 department receives the request.
 (b)  An official determination made under this section is
 valid until the regulation that is the subject of the determination
 is amended by statute or department rule.
 Sec. 438.154.  EFFECT OF OFFICIAL DETERMINATION. An
 inspector may not issue to a person a citation for a violation of a
 food regulation governed by this subtitle if the person provides
 the inspector with an official determination made under Section
 438.153 that contradicts the opinion of the inspector.
 Sec. 438.155.  RULES. (a)  The executive commissioner shall
 adopt rules to implement this subchapter.
 (b)  The executive commissioner periodically shall evaluate
 the department's food safety rules and modify the rules as
 necessary to improve consistency and communication in food
 regulation in this state.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Not later than December 1, 2013, the
 executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission
 shall adopt the rules necessary to implement Subchapter H, Chapter
 438, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  This Act applies only to a request for information or
 official determination made under Subchapter H, Chapter 438, Health
 and Safety Code, as added by this Act, to the Department of State
 Health Services on or after January 1, 2014. A request for
 information or official determination made to the Department of
 State Health Services before January 1, 2014, is governed by the law
 in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *