1 | 1 | | By: King of Taylor, Miller of Comal H.B. No. 1396 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) |
---|
3 | 3 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2013; |
---|
4 | 4 | | May 10, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
---|
5 | 5 | | and Human Services; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the |
---|
6 | 6 | | following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 11 | | relating to a study on alcohol and controlled substance statistics |
---|
12 | 12 | | prepared by the Department of Family and Protective Services and |
---|
13 | 13 | | the Department of State Health Services. |
---|
14 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 1. (a) The Department of Family and Protective |
---|
16 | 16 | | Services and the Department of State Health Services, using |
---|
17 | 17 | | existing resources, shall conduct a study on alcohol and controlled |
---|
18 | 18 | | substance statistics. The study must: |
---|
19 | 19 | | (1) determine whether either state agency currently |
---|
20 | 20 | | compiles information on: |
---|
21 | 21 | | (A) the number of children reported to the |
---|
22 | 22 | | department who at birth tested positive for the presence of alcohol |
---|
23 | 23 | | or a controlled substance; |
---|
24 | 24 | | (B) the controlled substances for which the |
---|
25 | 25 | | children described by Paragraph (A) of this subdivision tested |
---|
26 | 26 | | positive; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (C) the number of children described by Paragraph |
---|
28 | 28 | | (A) of this subdivision who were removed from their homes and have |
---|
29 | 29 | | been diagnosed as having a disability or chronic medical condition |
---|
30 | 30 | | resulting from the presence of alcohol or controlled substances; |
---|
31 | 31 | | and |
---|
32 | 32 | | (D) the number of parents who test positive for |
---|
33 | 33 | | the presence of a controlled substance during a department |
---|
34 | 34 | | investigation of a report of abuse or neglect of the parent's child; |
---|
35 | 35 | | and |
---|
36 | 36 | | (2) if neither agency compiles the information |
---|
37 | 37 | | described by Subdivision (1) of this subsection: |
---|
38 | 38 | | (A) determine which agency can compile the |
---|
39 | 39 | | information described by Subdivision (1) of this subsection most |
---|
40 | 40 | | effectively and at the lowest cost; and |
---|
41 | 41 | | (B) estimate the cost to that agency of compiling |
---|
42 | 42 | | the information, preparing a report on the information, posting a |
---|
43 | 43 | | copy of the report on the agency's Internet website, and |
---|
44 | 44 | | electronically submitting to the legislature a copy of the report. |
---|
45 | 45 | | (b) Not later than November 1, 2014, the Department of |
---|
46 | 46 | | Family and Protective Services and the Department of State Health |
---|
47 | 47 | | Services shall electronically submit a copy of the study prepared |
---|
48 | 48 | | under Subsection (a) of this section to the governor, lieutenant |
---|
49 | 49 | | governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and presiding |
---|
50 | 50 | | officer of each standing legislative committee with jurisdiction |
---|
51 | 51 | | over those departments. |
---|
52 | 52 | | (c) This section expires September 1, 2015. |
---|
53 | 53 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
54 | 54 | | * * * * * |
---|