Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1396 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: King of Taylor, Miller of Comal H.B. No. 1396
 (Senate Sponsor - Nelson)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2013;
 May 10, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study on alcohol and controlled substance statistics
 prepared by the Department of Family and Protective Services and
 the Department of State Health Services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  The Department of Family and Protective
 Services and the Department of State Health Services, using
 existing resources, shall conduct a study on alcohol and controlled
 substance statistics. The study must:
 (1)  determine whether either state agency currently
 compiles information on:
 (A)  the number of children reported to the
 department who at birth tested positive for the presence of alcohol
 or a controlled substance;
 (B)  the controlled substances for which the
 children described by Paragraph (A) of this subdivision tested
 positive;
 (C)  the number of children described by Paragraph
 (A) of this subdivision who were removed from their homes and have
 been diagnosed as having a disability or chronic medical condition
 resulting from the presence of alcohol or controlled substances;
 and
 (D)  the number of parents who test positive for
 the presence of a controlled substance during a department
 investigation of a report of abuse or neglect of the parent's child;
 and
 (2)  if neither agency compiles the information
 described by Subdivision (1) of this subsection:
 (A)  determine which agency can compile the
 information described by Subdivision (1) of this subsection most
 effectively and at the lowest cost; and
 (B)  estimate the cost to that agency of compiling
 the information, preparing a report on the information, posting a
 copy of the report on the agency's Internet website, and
 electronically submitting to the legislature a copy of the report.
 (b)  Not later than November 1, 2014, the Department of
 Family and Protective Services and the Department of State Health
 Services shall electronically submit a copy of the study prepared
 under Subsection (a) of this section to the governor, lieutenant
 governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and presiding
 officer of each standing legislative committee with jurisdiction
 over those departments.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2015.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *