Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1422 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Geren, Canales (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 1422
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2013;
 April 24, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 3, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 3, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the reporting in a lobbyist registration of certain
 persons from whom compensation or reimbursement is received.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 305.005, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (m) to read as follows:
 (m)  The registration form must include the full name and
 address of each person who compensates or reimburses the registrant
 or person acting as an agent for the registrant for services,
 including political consulting services, rendered by the
 registrant from:
 (1)  a political contribution as defined by Title 15,
 Election Code;
 (2)  interest received from a political contribution as
 defined by Title 15, Election Code; or
 (3)  an asset purchased with a political contribution
 as defined by Title 15, Election Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 305.005(m), Government Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to compensation or reimbursement received by
 a registrant under Chapter 305, Government Code, on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *