Senate | 05/09/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1709 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1709 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1588 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2844 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2594 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Record vote | RV#613 | Journal Page: 2593 |
House | 05/07/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2593 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2593 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2528 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Amended | 1-Canales | Journal Page: 2528 |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2528 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2163 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 522 | |
House | 02/26/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 522 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Filed |