House
|
04/29/2013
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
Journal Page: 1994
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
SB 297
|
Journal Page: 1994
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1005
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Referred to Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 498
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 498
|
House
|
02/19/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|