E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5441
|
E
|
05/20/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2155
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3691
|
House
|
05/18/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3911
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3591
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1727
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1196
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1196
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 991
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1679
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#221
|
Journal Page: 1604
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1604
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1604
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1569
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Branch
|
Journal Page: 1569
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1569
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1202
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 498
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 498
|
House
|
02/19/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|