1 | 1 | | By: Branch, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 1491 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2013; |
---|
3 | 3 | | April 24, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
---|
4 | 4 | | and Human Services; May 9, 2013, reported favorably by the |
---|
5 | 5 | | following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 9, 2013, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to the temporary licensing of a dentist who performs |
---|
11 | 11 | | voluntary charity care. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 256, Occupations Code, is |
---|
14 | 14 | | amended by adding Section 256.1016 to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 15 | | Sec. 256.1016. TEMPORARY LICENSE FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSE. |
---|
16 | 16 | | (a) In this section, "voluntary charity care" has the meaning |
---|
17 | 17 | | assigned by board rule under Section 256.102. |
---|
18 | 18 | | (b) The board shall grant a temporary license for a dentist |
---|
19 | 19 | | whose practice consists only of voluntary charity care to a |
---|
20 | 20 | | reputable dentist who meets the requirements of Sections |
---|
21 | 21 | | 256.101(a)(3), (4), and (5) and who: |
---|
22 | 22 | | (1) ceased practicing dentistry in another state that |
---|
23 | 23 | | the board has determined has licensing requirements that are |
---|
24 | 24 | | substantially similar to the requirements of this state not more |
---|
25 | 25 | | than two years before the date the dentist applies for a license |
---|
26 | 26 | | under this section and was licensed in good standing at the time the |
---|
27 | 27 | | dentist ceased practicing dentistry; or |
---|
28 | 28 | | (2) is currently licensed in another state that the |
---|
29 | 29 | | board has determined has licensing requirements that are |
---|
30 | 30 | | substantially similar to the requirements of this state. |
---|
31 | 31 | | (c) A dentist issued a license under this section shall: |
---|
32 | 32 | | (1) confine the dentist's practice to voluntary |
---|
33 | 33 | | charity care; |
---|
34 | 34 | | (2) practice only in a geographic area specified by |
---|
35 | 35 | | the license; and |
---|
36 | 36 | | (3) practice only for the period specified by the |
---|
37 | 37 | | license. |
---|
38 | 38 | | (d) The board shall adopt rules as necessary to implement |
---|
39 | 39 | | this section. |
---|
40 | 40 | | (e) The board shall take disciplinary action against a |
---|
41 | 41 | | dentist licensed under this section for a violation of this |
---|
42 | 42 | | subtitle or board rules in the same manner as against a dentist |
---|
43 | 43 | | licensed under Subchapter A. |
---|
44 | 44 | | SECTION 2. The State Board of Dental Examiners shall adopt |
---|
45 | 45 | | rules as necessary to implement Section 256.1016, Occupations Code, |
---|
46 | 46 | | as added by this Act, not later than January 1, 2014. |
---|
47 | 47 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
48 | 48 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
49 | 49 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
50 | 50 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
51 | 51 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
52 | 52 | | * * * * * |
---|