House | 05/08/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2815 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 654 | Journal Page: 2815 |
House | 05/07/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1456 | |
House | 03/27/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 499 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 499 | |
House | 02/19/2013 | Filed |