Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1589 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Cortez, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Van de Putte) H.B. No. 1589
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2013;
 April 17, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Veteran Affairs and Military Installations; May 9, 2013, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 9, 2013, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the awarding of the Texas Legislative Medal of Honor.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 431.131(d), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (d)  The legislature by concurrent resolution may direct the
 governor to award the Texas Legislative Medal of Honor to a person
 nominated by the nominating committee. The committee chairs
 serving on the nominating committee shall jointly prepare a
 concurrent resolution directing the governor to award the medal to
 a person nominated. The legislature may direct the medal to be
 awarded only during a regular session and may not, during a regular
 session, direct the medal to be awarded to more than:
 (1)  one person for service in the state or federal
 military forces during the period beginning after 1835 but before
 1956; and
 (2)  one person for service in the state or federal
 military forces after 1955 [during a regular session].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *