House | 05/06/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2550 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 506 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 506 | |
House | 02/20/2013 | Filed |