Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1678 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Frullo, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Duncan) H.B. No. 1678
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 17, 2013, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 17, 2013,
 sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for surviving
 spouses of disabled veterans of the United States armed forces;
 authorizing a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 504.317, Transportation Code, as added
 by Chapters 845 (H.B. 3580) and 1296 (H.B. 2357), Acts of the 82nd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, is amended by adding
 Subsections (c) and (d) to read as follows:
 (c)  A person entitled to specialty license plates under this
 section may register, for the person's own use, one vehicle without
 payment of any fee other than the fee for the license plates under
 Subsection (d).
 (d)  The fee for the first set of license plates is $3. There
 is no fee for each additional set of license plates.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *