House | 05/02/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2170 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 902 | Journal Page: 2170 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1456 | |
House | 03/26/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/06/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 262 | |
House | 02/06/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 262 | |
House | 11/13/2012 | Filed |