Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1728 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Ashby (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 1728
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of an unsworn declaration, the disposition of
 certain court exhibits, and the seal of a constitutional county
 court or county clerk.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 132.001(b), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  This section does not apply to a lien required to be
 filed with a county clerk, an instrument concerning real or
 personal property required to be filed with a county clerk, or an
 oath of office or an oath required to be taken before a specified
 official other than a notary public.
 SECTION 2.  Article 2.21(e), Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e)  An eligible exhibit may be disposed of as provided by
 this article:
 (1)  on or after the first anniversary of the date on
 which a conviction becomes final in the case, if the case is a
 misdemeanor or a felony for which the sentence imposed by the court
 is five years or less; [or]
 (2)  on or after the second anniversary of the date on
 which a conviction becomes final in the case, if the case is a
 non-capital felony for which the sentence imposed by the court is
 greater than five years;
 (3)  on or after the first anniversary of the date of
 the acquittal of a defendant; or
 (4)  on or after the first anniversary of the date of
 the death of a defendant.
 SECTION 3.  Section 26.005, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read
 as follows:
 (b)  The [impress of the] seal shall be impressed on
 [attached to] all process other than subpoenas issued out of the
 court and shall be used to authenticate the official acts of the
 county clerk and county judge. The seal may be created using
 electronic means, including by using an optical disk or another
 electronic reproduction technique, if the means by which the seal
 is impressed on an original document created using the same type of
 electronic means does not allow for changes, additions, or
 deletions to be made to the document.
 (c)  The signature of the county clerk may be affixed on an
 original document using electronic means, provided those means meet
 the requirements described by Subsection (b).
 (d)  A seal impressed or a signature affixed by electronic
 means may be delivered or transmitted electronically.
 SECTION 4.  Section 191.001(b), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The county clerk shall use the county court seal to
 authenticate all of the clerk's official acts as county recorder.
 The clerk may affix the seal on an original document by stamp,
 electronic means, facsimile, or other means that legibly reproduces
 all of the required elements of the seal for the purposes of
 reproduction.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *