Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1734 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Gutierrez (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 1734
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2013;
 May 10, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 17, 2013, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to
 printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the mayors of certain municipalities
 to call a special meeting.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 22.038(b), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The mayor may call a special meeting on the mayor's own
 motion and shall call a special meeting [or] on the application of
 three aldermen. Each member of the governing body, the secretary,
 and the municipal attorney must be notified of the special meeting.
 The notice may be given personally or left at the person's usual
 place of residence.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *