Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1760 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Darby (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 1760
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2013;
 April 24, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 9, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 9, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of services to certain individuals with
 developmental disabilities by a state supported living center.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 161.080, Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 161.080.  CONTRACTS FOR SERVICES FOR INDIVIDUALS WITH
 DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES. (a) A person that provides
 [disability] services to individuals with developmental
 disabilities may contract with a state supported living [school or
 state] center for the [school or] center to provide services and
 resources to support those individuals [with developmental
 disabilities, including individuals with dual diagnosis
 disorders].
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, a state supported living
 [school or state] center may provide nonresidential services to
 support an individual if:
 (1)  the individual:
 (A)  is receiving services in a program funded by
 the department;
 (B)  meets the eligibility criteria for the
 intermediate care facility for persons with intellectual
 disabilities [mental retardation] program; and
 (C)  resides in the area in which the state
 supported living [school or state] center is located; and
 (2)  the provision of services to the individual does
 not interfere with the provision of services to a resident of the
 state supported living [school or state] center.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 161, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 161.087 to read as follows:
 Sec. 161.087.  GIFTS AND GRANTS. (a) The department may
 accept gifts and grants of money, personal property, and real
 property from public or private sources to expand and improve the
 human services programs for the aging and disabled available in
 this state.
 (b)  The department shall use a gift or grant of money,
 personal property, or real property made for a specific purpose in
 accordance with the purpose expressly prescribed by the donor. The
 department may decline the gift or grant if the department
 determines that it cannot be economically used for that purpose.
 (c)  The department shall keep a record of each gift or grant
 in the department's central office in the city of Austin.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 22.001(f) and 101.026, Human Resources
 Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *