Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1781 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: King of Hemphill, et al. H.B. No. 1781
 (Senate Sponsor - Seliger)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2013;
 May 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Rural Affairs, and Homeland Security; May 17, 2013,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 3, Nays 0;
 May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a limitation on sanctions imposed on school districts
 for the sale of foods of minimal nutritional value.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 12, Agriculture Code, is amended by
 adding Section 12.0028 to read as follows:
 Sec. 12.0028.  LIMITATION ON SANCTIONS IMPOSED ON SCHOOL
 DISTRICTS FOR SALE OF FOODS OF MINIMAL NUTRITIONAL VALUE. (a)  In
 this section, "food of minimal nutritional value" has the meaning
 assigned by 7 C.F.R. Section 210.11(a)(2).
 (b)  The department may not impose on a school district a
 sanction, including disallowing meal reimbursement, based on the
 sale to students at a high school of food of minimal nutritional
 value, if the sale is approved in advance by the school and is made:
 (1)  outside of a school area designated for food
 service or food consumption or during a period other than a school
 meal service period; and
 (2)  for the purpose of raising money for a student
 organization or activity sponsored or sanctioned by the school or
 the school district in which the school is located.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *