House | 04/29/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2020 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 945 | Journal Page: 1987 |
House | 04/22/2013 | Postponed | 4/29/13 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 1723 |
House | 04/22/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1722 | |
House | 04/22/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1472 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 579 | |
House | 03/04/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 579 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Filed |