E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/23/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4878
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2752
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4062
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4294
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3905
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2160
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2160
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2160
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2160
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2160
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2160
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2160
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1869
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1752
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security
|
|
Journal Page: 1328
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1328
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1267
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2076
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1974
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#368
|
Journal Page: 1973
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1973
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1973
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1964
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1937
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1937
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1937
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Postponed
|
4/26/13 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1843
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1843
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1456
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
|
|
Journal Page: 581
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 581
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|