House | 05/09/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3005 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | CSSB 914 | Journal Page: 3005 |
House | 05/07/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2076 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 583 | |
House | 03/04/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 583 | |
House | 02/26/2013 | Filed |