Senate | 05/09/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1710 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1710 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1688 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3019 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2778 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Record vote | RV#680 | Journal Page: 2778 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2778 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2778 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2714 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2714 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2075 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 584 | |
House | 03/04/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 584 | |
House | 02/26/2013 | Filed |