Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1871 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: King of Zavala (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 1871
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2013;
 April 17, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 7, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 7, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the allocation of the expenses of a joint election to
 certain school districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.0581, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  The joint election agreement allocating expenses as
 provided by Section 271.004, Election Code, must provide that a
 school district is responsible only for the proportion of election
 expenses that corresponds to the proportion that the number of
 registered voters in the school district bears to the total number
 of registered voters in all political subdivisions participating in
 the joint election.  This subsection applies only to a school
 district:
 (1)  that has territory located in at least four
 counties, each of which has a population of less than 46,100; and
 (2)  no part of which is located in a municipality.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *