House | 05/02/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2192 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1537 | Journal Page: 2192 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1734 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 587 | |
House | 03/04/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 587 | |
House | 02/26/2013 | Filed |