1 | 1 | | By: Cortez, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Campbell) H.B. No. 1960 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2013; |
---|
3 | 3 | | April 29, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | 4 | | Veteran Affairs and Military Installations; May 17, 2013, reported |
---|
5 | 5 | | favorably by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent |
---|
6 | 6 | | to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 11 | | relating to reciprocity for emergency medical services personnel |
---|
12 | 12 | | certification for certain United States military personnel. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Section 773.050, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
15 | 15 | | amended by adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (c-1) In this subsection, "United States military" means |
---|
17 | 17 | | the United States Army, the United States Navy, the United States |
---|
18 | 18 | | Air Force, the United States Marine Corps, the United States Coast |
---|
19 | 19 | | Guard, any reserve or auxiliary component of any of those services, |
---|
20 | 20 | | or the National Guard. The executive commissioner by rule shall |
---|
21 | 21 | | provide that an individual is eligible for emergency medical |
---|
22 | 22 | | services personnel certification through reciprocity if the |
---|
23 | 23 | | individual: |
---|
24 | 24 | | (1) successfully completed emergency medical services |
---|
25 | 25 | | training provided by the United States military; |
---|
26 | 26 | | (2) has emergency medical services personnel |
---|
27 | 27 | | credentials from the United States military; and |
---|
28 | 28 | | (3) is certified by the National Registry of Emergency |
---|
29 | 29 | | Medical Technicians. |
---|
30 | 30 | | SECTION 2. Not later than January 1, 2014, the executive |
---|
31 | 31 | | commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall |
---|
32 | 32 | | adopt rules necessary to implement Section 773.050(c-1), Health and |
---|
33 | 33 | | Safety Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
34 | 34 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
35 | 35 | | * * * * * |
---|