Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1960 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Cortez, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Campbell) H.B. No. 1960
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2013;
 April 29, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Veteran Affairs and Military Installations; May 17, 2013, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to reciprocity for emergency medical services personnel
 certification for certain United States military personnel.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 773.050, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows:
 (c-1)  In this subsection, "United States military" means
 the United States Army, the United States Navy, the United States
 Air Force, the United States Marine Corps, the United States Coast
 Guard, any reserve or auxiliary component of any of those services,
 or the National Guard.  The executive commissioner by rule shall
 provide that an individual is eligible for emergency medical
 services personnel certification through reciprocity if the
 individual:
 (1)  successfully completed emergency medical services
 training provided by the United States military;
 (2)  has emergency medical services personnel
 credentials from the United States military; and
 (3)  is certified by the National Registry of Emergency
 Medical Technicians.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2014, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 adopt rules necessary to implement Section 773.050(c-1), Health and
 Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *