06/14/2013 | Effective immediately | |||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5442 | |
E | 05/27/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5440 | |
Senate | 05/26/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3814 | |
House | 05/25/2013 | Signed in the House | ||
House | 05/24/2013 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/23/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4544 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2897 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2897 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2897 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2897 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2897 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2897 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2897 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2034 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 1724 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1724 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1714 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3091 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Record vote | RV#723 | Journal Page: 2887 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2887 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2887 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2802 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Amended | 1-Kolkhorst | Journal Page: 2802 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2801 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2028 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 609 | |
House | 03/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 609 | |
House | 02/27/2013 | Filed |