Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1966 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Deshotel (Senate Sponsor - Williams) H.B. No. 1966
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2013;
 May 10, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Economic
 Development; May 17, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a project that may be undertaken by certain development
 corporations in connection with infrastructure improvements
 necessary for municipal area development and revitalization.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 501, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 501.108 to read as follows:
 Sec. 501.108.  INFRASTRUCTURE IMPROVEMENT PROJECTS BY
 CORPORATIONS AUTHORIZED BY CERTAIN COASTAL MUNICIPALITIES. (a)
 This section applies only to a corporation the creation of which was
 authorized by a municipality that:
 (1)  has a population of 10,000 or more;
 (2)  is located in a county bordering the Gulf of Mexico
 or the Gulf Intracoastal Waterway; and
 (3)  has, or is included in a metropolitan statistical
 area of this state that has, an unemployment rate that averaged at
 least two percent above the state average for the most recent two
 consecutive years for which statistics are available.
 (b)  For a corporation to which this section applies,
 "project" includes expenditures found by the board of directors to
 be required or suitable for infrastructure improvements necessary
 to develop and revitalize areas in the corporation's authorizing
 municipality, including:
 (1)  streets and roads, rail spurs, water and sewer
 utilities, electric utilities, gas utilities, drainage, site
 improvements, and related improvements;
 (2)  telecommunications, data, or Internet
 improvements; or
 (3)  facilities designed to remediate, mitigate, or
 control erosion, including coastal erosion along the Gulf of Mexico
 or the Gulf Intracoastal Waterway.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *