1 | 1 | | By: J. Davis of Harris, et al. H.B. No. 1971 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (Senate Sponsor - Deuell) |
---|
3 | 3 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013; |
---|
4 | 4 | | May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
---|
5 | 5 | | and Human Services; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the |
---|
6 | 6 | | following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 11 | | relating to a pilot program conducted by the Department of Aging and |
---|
12 | 12 | | Disability Services to authorize certain accreditation surveys of |
---|
13 | 13 | | assisted living facilities. |
---|
14 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 247, Health and Safety |
---|
16 | 16 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 247.033 to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 17 | | Sec. 247.033. ACCREDITATION SURVEY PILOT PROGRAM. (a) The |
---|
18 | 18 | | department may develop and implement a pilot program to authorize |
---|
19 | 19 | | the use of an accreditation survey that complies with Section |
---|
20 | 20 | | 247.032(b) to fulfill the requirements for a life and safety code |
---|
21 | 21 | | survey or inspection or another survey or inspection required by |
---|
22 | 22 | | this subchapter. If the department implements the pilot program, |
---|
23 | 23 | | the department may implement the pilot program with the goal that |
---|
24 | 24 | | not later than August 31, 2014, at least one assisted living |
---|
25 | 25 | | facility will have used an accreditation survey for the purposes of |
---|
26 | 26 | | this section. The accreditation commission's standards must meet |
---|
27 | 27 | | or exceed the assisted living facility licensing requirements |
---|
28 | 28 | | established by the executive commissioner of the Health and Human |
---|
29 | 29 | | Services Commission as required by Section 247.032(b)(1). |
---|
30 | 30 | | (b) This section expires September 1, 2015. |
---|
31 | 31 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
32 | 32 | | * * * * * |
---|