Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1971 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: J. Davis of Harris, et al. H.B. No. 1971
 (Senate Sponsor - Deuell)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a pilot program conducted by the Department of Aging and
 Disability Services to authorize certain accreditation surveys of
 assisted living facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 247, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 247.033 to read as follows:
 Sec. 247.033.  ACCREDITATION SURVEY PILOT PROGRAM. (a) The
 department may develop and implement a pilot program to authorize
 the use of an accreditation survey that complies with Section
 247.032(b) to fulfill the requirements for a life and safety code
 survey or inspection or another survey or inspection required by
 this subchapter.  If the department implements the pilot program,
 the department may implement the pilot program with the goal that
 not later than August 31, 2014, at least one assisted living
 facility will have used an accreditation survey for the purposes of
 this section.  The accreditation commission's standards must meet
 or exceed the assisted living facility licensing requirements
 established by the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission as required by Section 247.032(b)(1).
 (b)  This section expires September 1, 2015.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *