Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2006 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Klick (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 2006
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2013;
 May 10, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility for appointment as a central counting
 station manager.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 127.002(b), Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  To be eligible for appointment, a person must:
 (1)  have knowledge and experience in the conduct of
 elections with the electronic voting system for which the counting
 station is established; and
 (2)  be a registered voter of the political subdivision
 served by the authority establishing the counting station, except:
 (A)  during the first year following the adoption
 of the voting system; or
 (B)  if the person is an employee of the political
 subdivision that adopts or owns the voting system.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *