Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2112 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Raymond (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2112
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2013;
 May 6, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to
 printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to financial disclosure reports made by a member of a
 county planning commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 232.094, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 232.094.  FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE. (a)  The commissioners
 court of a county may require each [A] member of the planning
 commission to [shall] file a financial disclosure report in the
 same manner as required for county officers under Subchapter B,
 Chapter 159.
 (b)  If the commissioners court requires a financial
 disclosure report but [of the county in which the planning
 commission member serves] has not adopted a financial disclosure
 reporting system under Subchapter B, Chapter 159, the planning
 commission member shall file a financial disclosure report in the
 same manner as required for county officers under Subchapter A,
 Chapter 159.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *