Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2263 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Miller of Fort Bend (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 2263
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 7, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 7, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requesting a replacement voter registration
 certificate by telephone or electronically.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 15.004, Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 15.004.  REPLACEMENT CERTIFICATE. (a)  A voter whose
 registration certificate is lost or destroyed may obtain a
 replacement certificate by:
 (1)  delivering a written or electronic[, signed]
 notice of the loss or destruction to the registrar; or
 (2)  telephoning the registrar to request a
 replacement.
 (b)  A replacement certificate requested electronically
 under Subsection (a)(1) or by telephone under Subsection (a)(2) may
 be sent only to the mailing address on the voter's registration
 records.
 (c)  Subject to Subsection (b), not [Not] later than the 30th
 day after the date the registrar receives the notice or request, the
 registrar shall deliver to the voter a replacement certificate
 containing:
 (1)  the registration number and other information on
 the lost or destroyed certificate; and
 (2)  a notation that the certificate is a replacement.
 (d) [(c)]  The registrar shall retain a written or electronic
 [the] notice submitted under Subsection (a)(1) on file with the
 voter's registration application. If the voter requests a
 replacement registration certificate by telephone under Subsection
 (a)(2), the registrar shall make a written record of the request and
 keep the record on file with the voter's registration application.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *