Senate | 05/09/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1710 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1710 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1589 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2844 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2618 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Record vote | RV#637 | Journal Page: 2617 |
House | 05/07/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2617 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2617 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2540 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2540 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Amended | 1-Collier | Journal Page: 2540 |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2540 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1457 | |
House | 04/02/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 677 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 677 | |
House | 03/04/2013 | Filed |