Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2290 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lozano, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 2290
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 8, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 10, Nays 1; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use for administrative costs of a portion of money
 received by certain entities to implement a supplemental
 environmental project.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 7.067, Water Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  The commission may allow a local government or an
 organization exempt from federal income taxation under Section
 501(a), Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as an organization described
 by Section 501(c)(3) of that code, that receives money from a
 respondent to implement a supplemental environmental project under
 this section to use a portion of the money, not to exceed 10 percent
 of the direct cost of the project, for administrative costs,
 including overhead costs, personnel salary and fringe benefits, and
 travel and per diem expenses, associated with implementing the
 project.  Money used for administrative costs under this subsection
 must be used in accordance with Chapter 783, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 7.067(c), Water Code, as added by this
 Act, applies to money received to implement a supplemental
 environmental project under Section 7.067, Water Code, regardless
 of whether the money was received on, before, or after the effective
 date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *