E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/25/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5391
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4535
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4555
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4073
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2446
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2446
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2446
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2446
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2446
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2445
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2445
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1763
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1379
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1312
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1115
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1115
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1698
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#233
|
Journal Page: 1665
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1665
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1665
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1642
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1642
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1544
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 679
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 679
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|