House | 04/30/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2075 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Recommitted to committee | Journal Page: 1974 | |
House | 04/05/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1456 | |
House | 04/01/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform | Journal Page: 681 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 681 | |
House | 03/05/2013 | Filed |