Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2356 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: White (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 2356
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 14, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 14, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of Recreational Road 255 in
 Jasper County as Sam Rayburn Parkway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.092 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.092.  SAM RAYBURN PARKWAY.  (a)  The portion of
 Recreational Road 255 between State Highway 63 and U.S. Highway 96
 in Jasper County is designated as Sam Rayburn Parkway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as Sam Rayburn Parkway and any other appropriate
 information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the road and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the road.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *