House | 05/10/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3025 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | CSSB 1541 | Journal Page: 3025 |
House | 05/10/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1913 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 684 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 684 | |
House | 03/05/2013 | Filed |