Senate | 05/10/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1724 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1724 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1714 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3091 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Record vote | RV#736 | Journal Page: 2899 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2899 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2899 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2812 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Amended | 1-Carter | Journal Page: 2812 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2811 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1581 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 684 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 684 | |
House | 03/05/2013 | Filed |