Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB241 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Otto, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 241
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 4, 2013;
 April 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 10, 2013, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 10, 2013, sent to
 printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the notice provided by the chief appraiser of an
 appraisal district of the availability of agreement forms
 authorizing certain electronic communications.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1.085(h), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (h)  This subsection applies to the chief appraiser of an
 appraisal district only if the appraisal district is located in a
 county described by Subsection (g) or the chief appraiser has
 decided to authorize electronic communication under this section
 and the appraisal district has implemented a system that allows
 such communication.  The chief appraiser shall provide notice
 regarding the availability of agreement forms authorizing
 electronic communication under this section.  The chief appraiser
 shall provide the notice by:
 (1)  publishing a notice in a newspaper having general
 circulation in the district at least once on or before February 1 of
 each year that includes the words "Notice of Availability of
 Electronic Communications"; or
 (2)  delivering the agreement form on or before
 February 1, or as soon as practicable after that date, to each owner
 of property shown on the certified appraisal roll for the preceding
 tax year and on or before February 1 of each subsequent year, or as
 soon as practicable after that date, to each new owner of property
 shown on the certified appraisal roll for the preceding tax year.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *